Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 865 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4568 Week
» 3306 Month
» 417627 Year
» 1639192 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 122 m/e 04/1907
North Eastern Railway 3122 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2503   30/05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/104/1907
Q10/226/11/1926
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 904
To Service During 04/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Fri 30/10/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 04/1907
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 07/04/1930
SEL Selby on 29/12/1930
MAR March on 08/08/1931
SEL Selby on 22/10/1931
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_122)
26/11/1926 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1808)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 24/11/1922 10/09/1923 291 days General  
Darlington Works 07/11/1924 23/03/1925 137 days General  
Darlington Works 11/08/1925 28/09/1925 49 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 02/07/1926 26/11/1926 148 days General
Boiler number D1808 (Diagram Q10domed)
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1930 16/07/1930 86 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 122
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 904
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3122    
30/05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2503    
07/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
29/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
08/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
22/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
30/10/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2503 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev