Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 855 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4558 Week
» 3296 Month
» 417617 Year
» 1639182 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 123 m/e 05/1907
North Eastern Railway 3123 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2504   15/03/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/105/1907
Q10/205/11/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 905
To Service During 05/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Fri 30/10/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs , 6 mths

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 05/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
DON Doncaster on 01/01/1931
MEX Mexborough on 06/01/1931
MAR March on 15/07/1931
SEL Selby on 22/10/1931
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_123)
05/11/1924 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1674)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 04/06/1924 05/11/1924 155 days General
Boiler number D1674 (Diagram Q10domed)
 
Darlington Works 16/02/1926 30/03/1926 43 days General  
Darlington Works 05/11/1929 30/01/1930 87 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 123
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 905
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3123    
15/03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2504    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
01/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
22/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
30/10/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2504 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev