Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 853 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4556 Week
» 3294 Month
» 417615 Year
» 1639180 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 124 m/e 05/1907
North Eastern Railway 3124 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2505   15/10/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/105/1907
Q10/227/10/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 906
To Service During 05/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Thu 06/08/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 05/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
MEX Mexborough on 01/01/1931
SEL Selby on 30/07/1931
   Withdrawn on 06/08/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_124)
27/10/1924 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1661)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 11/05/1923 27/10/1924 536 days General
Boiler number D1661 (Diagram Q10domed)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2505
 
Darlington Works 18/09/1928 13/11/1928 57 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 124
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 906
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3124    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
01/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
06/08/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2505 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev