Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 849 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4552 Week
» 3290 Month
» 417611 Year
» 1639176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 125 m/e 06/1907
North Eastern Railway 3125 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2506   26/06/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/106/1907
Q10/220/10/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 907
To Service During 06/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Thu 13/08/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 06/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
MEX Mexborough on 01/01/1931
SEL Selby on 06/08/1931
   Withdrawn on 13/08/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/03/1923 30/05/1923 69 days General  
Darlington Works 08/04/1925 06/10/1925 182 days General  
Darlington Works 29/07/1927 20/10/1927 84 days General
D1988 (new) 20/10/27 bQ10domed
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 125
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 907
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3125    
26/06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2506    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
01/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
13/08/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2506 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev