Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 863 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 3304 Month
» 417625 Year
» 1639190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 126 m/e 06/1907
North Eastern Railway 3126 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2507   24/10/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/106/1907
Q10/229/10/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 908
To Service During 06/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Thu 13/08/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 06/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
DON Doncaster on 01/01/1931
MEX Mexborough on 06/01/1931
SEL Selby on 10/08/1931
   Withdrawn on 13/08/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_126)
29/10/1924 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number D1670)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 13/11/1922 30/04/1923 169 days General  
Darlington Works 05/05/1924 29/10/1924 178 days General
Boiler number D1670 (Diagram Q10)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2507
 
Darlington Works 23/06/1928 27/08/1928 66 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 126
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 908
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3126    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
01/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
13/08/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2507 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev