Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 854 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4557 Week
» 3295 Month
» 417616 Year
» 1639181 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 127 m/e 09/1907
North Eastern Railway 3127 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2508   18/03/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/109/1907
Q10/230/03/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 942
To Service During 09/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Fri 30/10/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 09/1907
CUD Cudworth on 31/01/1925
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
MEX Mexborough on 02/01/1931
MAR March on 14/09/1931
SEL Selby on 23/10/1931
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_127)
30/03/1927 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1815)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 28/08/1923 21/12/1923 116 days General  
Darlington Works 08/12/1926 30/03/1927 113 days General
Boiler number D1815 (Diagram Q10domed)
 
Darlington Works 16/06/1930 17/09/1930 94 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 127
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 942
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3127    
18/03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2508    
31/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
02/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
23/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
30/10/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2508 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev