Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 850 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4553 Week
» 3291 Month
» 417612 Year
» 1639177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 128 m/e 10/1907
North Eastern Railway 3128 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2509   23/05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/110/1907
Q10/223/02/1925
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 943
To Service During 10/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Thu 01/10/1931 off Selby (SEL)
Service Life 24 yrs , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 10/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
MAR March on 10/08/1931
SEL Selby on 21/09/1931
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_128)
23/02/1925 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1704)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/06/1922 04/12/1922 169 days General  
Darlington Works 15/12/1924 23/02/1925 71 days General
Boiler number D1704 (Diagram Q10domed)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1927 20/02/1928 97 days General  
Darlington Works 27/06/1930 22/09/1930 88 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 128
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 943
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 3128    
23/05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2509    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
10/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
21/09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
01/10/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2509 from Selby (SEL)    

prev prev