Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 937 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4640 Week
» 3378 Month
» 417699 Year
» 1639264 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 130 m/e 10/1907
North Eastern Railway 3130 y/e 1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2511   25/07/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class Q10
Company History HBR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q10/110/1907
Q10/219/01/1925
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 945
To Service During 10/1907 to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Withdrawal Thu 01/10/1931 off Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Service Life 24 yrs , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlngton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLS Hull Springhead (New) m/e 10/1907
SEL Selby on 18/11/1929
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 29/12/1930
MAR March on 08/08/1931
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/09/1931
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1907 Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_130)
19/01/1925 Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1685)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 01/07/1924 19/01/1925 203 days General
Boiler number D1685 (Diagram Q10domed)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2511
 
Darlington Works 21/03/1927 08/06/1927 80 days General  
Darlington Works 04/06/1929 15/08/1929 73 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1907 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 130
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 945
Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted
   
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
29/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
08/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/10/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 2511 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    

prev prev