Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1024 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18827 Week
» 71843 Month
» 191370 Year
» 3218223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
131 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3131 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2512 |
|
29/02/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
on |
15/08/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_131) |
31/03/1928 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D2003) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
1921 |
09/1921 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
07/06/1922 |
19/04/1923 |
317 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
04/08/1924 |
27/11/1924 |
116 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
24/12/1925 |
28/04/1926 |
126 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
28/12/1927 |
31/03/1928 |
95 days |
General |
Boiler number D2003 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 131 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 946 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3131 |
|
|
07/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1922. Dep: 19/04/1923. |
|
|
29/02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2512 |
|
|
04/08/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1924. Dep: 27/11/1924. |
|
|
24/12/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1925. Dep: 28/04/1926. |
|
|
28/12/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1927. Dep: 31/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2003 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
12/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
01/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2512 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|