Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 152 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3665 Week
» 23958 Month
» 201862 Year
» 1867238 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 407 m/e 04/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (Tmp) 407N   11/01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3407   02/11/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q2
Company History GNR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat04/1902
Q2 (0-8-0)23/07/1912
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 229
Works Number 967
To Service During 04/1902 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Sat 16/06/1934 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
ARD   Ardsley (New) m/e 04/1902
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1934

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1902 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1396)
07/04/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1399)
23/07/1912 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7135)
02/11/1928 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 8088)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 04/1910   General    
Doncaster Works 04/1910   General Rebuilt to class Q2
 
Doncaster Works 1912 23/07/1912   General Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 7135 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 1919 01/11/1919   General    
Doncaster Works 24/09/1923 11/01/1924 110 days General Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 407N
 
Doncaster Works 02/07/1924 22/08/1924 52 days Light Repair    
Doncaster Works 29/09/1928 02/11/1928 35 days General Boiler number 8088 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3407
 
Doncaster Works 13/06/1931 18/07/1931 36 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 407
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 967
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
04/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910.    
04/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q2
   
07/04/1910 Modification Diagram 4Sat number 1399 boiler fitted    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 23/07/1912.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 7135 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919.    
24/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1923. Dep: 11/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 407N
   
02/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1924. Dep: 22/08/1924.    
29/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 02/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8088 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3407
   
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931.    
16/06/1934 Withdrawn Condemned as 3407 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev