Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 216 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 21300 Month
» 254220 Year
» 1919596 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 408 m/e 07/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3408   08/11/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q1
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat07/1902
Q1 Super (0-8-0)08/1916
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 229
Works Number 969
To Service During 07/1902 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1927 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
CLK   Colwick (New) m/e 07/1902
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1927

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1902 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1398)
07/03/1909 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1574)
18/08/1916 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1540)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 03/1909   General    
Doncaster Works 03/1909   General    
Doncaster Works 1916 18/08/1916   General Boiler number 1540 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 17/08/1921 25/02/1922 193 days General    
Doncaster Works 09/07/1924 08/11/1924 123 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3408
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1902 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 408
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 969
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
03/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/03/1909.    
03/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/03/1909.    
07/03/1909 Modification Diagram 14 number 1574 boiler fitted    
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 18/08/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1540 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
17/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1921. Dep: 25/02/1922.    
09/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3408
   
02/09/1927 Withdrawn Condemned as 3408 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev