Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 131 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3644 Week
» 23937 Month
» 201841 Year
» 1867217 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 409 m/e 06/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (Tmp) 409N   13/10/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3409   26/06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q1
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat06/1902
Q1 Super (0-8-0)11/1914
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 229
Works Number 970
To Service During 06/1902 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Wed 05/08/1931 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
CLK   Colwick (New) m/e 06/1902
     Withdrawn on 05/08/1931

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1902 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1399)
07/04/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1564)
20/11/1914 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1544)
26/06/1926 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7835)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 04/1910   General    
Doncaster Works 04/1910   General    
Doncaster Works 1914 20/11/1914   General Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 11/07/1923 13/10/1923 95 days General Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 409N
 
Doncaster Works 08/03/1926 26/06/1926 111 days General Boiler number 7835 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3409
 
Doncaster Works 08/12/1928 19/01/1929 43 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1902 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 409
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 970
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
04/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910.    
04/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910.    
07/04/1910 Modification Diagram 4Sat number 1564 boiler fitted    
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 20/11/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
11/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 409N
   
08/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1926. Dep: 26/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7835 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3409
   
08/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929.    
05/08/1931 Withdrawn Condemned as 3409 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev