Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 841 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6241 Week
» 24293 Month
» 257213 Year
» 1922589 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 410 m/e 07/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3410   04/07/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q2
Company History GNR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat07/1902
Q2 (0-8-0)12/06/1912
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 229
Works Number 971
To Service During 07/1902 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Fri 18/10/1935 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
CLK   Colwick (New) m/e 07/1902
ARD   Ardsley on 10/08/1932
     Withdrawn on 18/10/1935

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1902 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1400)
02/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1546)
12/06/1912 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7134)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 02/1910   General    
Doncaster Works 02/1910   General Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Doncaster Works 1912 12/06/1912   General Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 7134 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1922 09/12/1922 145 days General    
Doncaster Works 06/02/1925 04/07/1925 149 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3410
 
Doncaster Works 31/03/1927 31/08/1927 154 days General    
Doncaster Works 05/10/1929 02/11/1929 29 days General    
Doncaster Works 14/05/1932 11/06/1932 29 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1902 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 410
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 971
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
02/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1910.    
02/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1910.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 12/06/1912.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 7134 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
18/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1922. Dep: 09/12/1922.    
06/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3410
   
31/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1927. Dep: 31/08/1927.    
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.    
14/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932.    
10/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
18/10/1935 Withdrawn Condemned as 3410 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev