|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 08/03/1912 | General | Boiler number 7132 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1920 | 27/11/1920 | 68 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1923 | 09/02/1924 | 129 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3415 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1926 | 18/01/1927 | 189 days | General | Boiler number 7199 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 415 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 983 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 08/03/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7132 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
21/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1920. Dep: 27/11/1920. | ||
04/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1923. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3415 |
||
14/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1926. Dep: 18/01/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7199 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
18/05/1929 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3415 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) |