|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/1909 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 05/09/1911 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1537 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1913 | 14/02/1914 | 152 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7250 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1924 | 22/01/1925 | 112 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3420 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1925 | 02/01/1926 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1927 | 13/05/1927 | 73 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7252 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 22 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 420 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 988 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1909 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1398 boiler fitted | ||
07/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/07/1909. | ||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 05/09/1911. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1537 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
16/09/1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1913. Dep: 14/02/1914. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7250 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
03/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1924. Dep: 22/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3420 |
||
15/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
10/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1925. Dep: 02/01/1926. | ||
02/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1927. Dep: 13/05/1927. | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7252 (Diagram 3) |
||
10/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. | ||
10/02/1937 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3420 from Ardsley (ARD) |