Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2246 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15652 Week
» 68668 Month
» 188195 Year
» 3215048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
422 |
m/e |
08/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3422 |
|
01/08/1925 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1903 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1539) |
24/12/1912 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7140) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
1912 |
24/12/1912 |
|
General |
Boiler number 7140 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
27/09/1922 |
21/03/1923 |
176 days |
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
01/05/1925 |
01/08/1925 |
93 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3422
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 422 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1008 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 24/12/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7140 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
27/09/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1922. Dep: 21/03/1923. |
|
|
01/05/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3422
|
|
|
01/08/1928 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3422 from New England (NWE) |
|
|