|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1915 | 04/06/1915 | General | Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1922 | 17/06/1922 | 124 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1924 | 27/05/1925 | 167 days | General | Boiler number 7734 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3424 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1925 | 27/08/1925 | 11 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 424 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1010 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 04/06/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
14/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922. | ||
12/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1924. Dep: 27/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7734 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3424 |
||
17/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1925. Dep: 27/08/1925. | ||
10/10/1927 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3424 from New England (NWE) |