|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/1908 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 10/1908 | General | Boiler number 401 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 19/10/1912 | General | Boiler number 7137 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1924 | 29/05/1925 | 169 days | General | Boiler number 7735 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3427 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 427 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1012 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
10/1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/10/1908. | ||
10/1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/10/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 401 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 19/10/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7137 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
17/12/1921 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1410 boiler fitted | ||
12/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1924. Dep: 29/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7735 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3427 |
||
11/04/1929 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3427 from New England (NWE) |