|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 04/04/1914 | General | Boiler number 7203 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1921 | 18/02/1922 | 150 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1924 | 24/01/1925 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1547 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3430 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1927 | 26/01/1928 | 98 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 430 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1014 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
07/10/1911 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1401 boiler fitted | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 04/04/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7203 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
22/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1921. Dep: 18/02/1922. | ||
11/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1924. Dep: 24/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1547 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3430 |
||
21/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1927. Dep: 26/01/1928. | ||
03/10/1931 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3430 |