Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 991 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 6966 Week
» 105611 Month
» 308275 Year
» 3335128 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
433 |
m/e |
03/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3433 |
|
29/11/1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
233 |
Works Number |
1028 |
To Service |
During 03/1904 to Colwick (CLK) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/02/1930 off Ardsley (ARD) |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1904 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1551) |
12/1909 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1567) |
06/1916 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1571) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 433 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1028 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1909. |
|
|
06/1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/06/1916. |
|
|
04/05/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1921. Dep: 17/09/1921. |
|
|
31/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3433
|
|
|
11/10/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1926. Dep: 19/03/1927. |
|
|
08/02/1930 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3433 from Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|