Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 142 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3655 Week
» 23948 Month
» 201852 Year
» 1867228 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 434 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3434   16/05/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q1
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat03/1904
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 233
Works Number 1029
To Service During 03/1904 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Wed 27/06/1928 off Hitchin (GNR) (HIT )
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
NWE   New England (New) m/e 03/1904
HSY   Hornsey m/e 05/1926
HIT   Hitchin (GNR) on 18/01/1928
     Withdrawn on 27/06/1928

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1555)
07/01/1913 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1399)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/1913   General    
Doncaster Works 01/1913   General    
Doncaster Works 23/05/1921 22/10/1921 153 days General    
Doncaster Works 10/01/1925 16/05/1925 127 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3434
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 434
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1029
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
01/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/01/1913.    
01/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/01/1913.    
07/01/1913 Modification Diagram 4Sat number 1399 boiler fitted    
23/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921.    
10/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1925. Dep: 16/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3434
   
05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
18/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT )    
27/06/1928 Withdrawn Condemned as 3434 from Hitchin (GNR) (HITL)    

prev prev