Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 783 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6183 Week
» 24235 Month
» 257155 Year
» 1922531 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 435 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3435   23/05/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q1
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat03/1904
Q1 Super (0-8-0)10/1912
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 233
Works Number 1050
To Service During 03/1904 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Fri 17/05/1929 off Hornsey (HSY)
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
NWE   New England (New) m/e 03/1904
HSY   Hornsey m/e 05/1926
     Withdrawn on 17/05/1929

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1552)
11/11/1912 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7138)
23/05/1925 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 983)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 1912 11/11/1912   General Boiler number 7138 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 07/01/1922 13/05/1922 127 days General    
Doncaster Works 08/01/1925 23/05/1925 136 days General Boiler number 983 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3435
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 435
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1050
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 11/11/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7138 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
07/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922.    
08/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1925. Dep: 23/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 983 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3435
   
05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
17/05/1929 Withdrawn Condemned as 3435 from Hornsey (HSY)    

prev prev