Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3606 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17012 Week
» 70028 Month
» 189555 Year
» 3216408 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
440 |
m/e |
09/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3440 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1904 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1554) |
08/08/1913 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7197) |
27/02/1926 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7832) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
1913 |
08/08/1913 |
|
General |
Boiler number 7197 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
03/05/1923 |
04/08/1923 |
94 days |
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
16/11/1925 |
27/02/1926 |
104 days |
General |
Boiler number 7832 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
29/08/1928 |
13/10/1928 |
46 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 440 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1055 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 08/08/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7197 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
03/05/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923. |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3440 |
|
|
16/11/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1925. Dep: 27/02/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7832 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
29/08/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928. |
|
|
28/11/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3440 from Colwick (CLK) |
|
|