Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 457 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6068 Week
» 17114 Month
» 17114 Year
» 1682490 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1172 m/e 01/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6172 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9902 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 69902 w/e 04/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class S1
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-4T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9655
Works Number 5004
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1908
Withdrawal Fri 13/01/1956
Scrapping During 02/1956
Service Life 48 yrs , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1908
MAR March on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36B Mexborough 4w/e 20/01/1951
36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/01/1954
   Withdrawn on 13/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   on 13/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1940 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1956 York MPD December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton.
On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation.
SLS/195605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1908 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1172
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5004
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6172    
07/1940 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9902    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
04/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69902    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69902    

prev prev