Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 900 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6396 Week
» 25297 Month
» 25297 Year
» 1690673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1173 m/e 01/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6173 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9903 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 69903 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class S1
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-4T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9655
Works Number 5005
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1908
Withdrawal Mon 08/03/1954
Scrapping During 04/1954
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1908
MAR March on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36B Mexborough 4w/e 23/12/1950
40B Immingham 4w/e 21/11/1953
   Withdrawn on 08/03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 36B Mexborough m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   on 08/03/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1908 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1173
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5005
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6173    
12/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9903    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69903    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
08/03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69903    

prev prev