Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 990 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5482 Week
» 30316 Month
» 64648 Year
» 1730024 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2909 m/e 02/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7609 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67609 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V102/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)10/1953
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 319
Works Number 1754
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1931
Withdrawal w/e Mon 05/02/1962
Service Life 31 yrs , 5 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1931
STM   St Margarets on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65E   Kipps 4w/e 02/08/1958
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 19/11/1960
65E   Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/11/1960
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 05/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2909    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7609    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67609    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
05/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67609    
02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev