Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 66 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5597 Week
» 30431 Month
» 64763 Year
» 1730139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2912 m/e 04/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7612 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67612 on 19/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V104/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)09/1953
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1757
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal Sat 21/01/1961
Service Life 29 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1931
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 21/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 21/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/07/1961 Cowlairs Works (Scrap Road) Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2912    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7612    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
19/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67612    
21/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67612    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev