Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 74 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5605 Week
» 30439 Month
» 64771 Year
» 1730147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2913 m/e 05/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7613 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67613 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V105/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)04/1956
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1758
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1931
Withdrawal Thu 25/01/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1931
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 21/10/1961
67B   Hurlford 6w/e 30/12/1961
     Withdrawn on 25/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 2w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 6w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   on 25/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2913    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7613    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67613    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
25/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67613    
01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev