Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3516 Week
» 28350 Month
» 62682 Year
» 1728058 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2914 m/e 06/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7614 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67614 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V106/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)09/1958
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1759
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1931
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/07/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1931
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B   Hurlford 6w/e 30/12/1961
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 21/04/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 30/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 6w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 5w/e 12/05/1962
WDN   w/e 30/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2914    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7614    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67614    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
30/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67614    
08/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev