Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4721 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20333 Week
» 118978 Month
» 321642 Year
» 3348495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
2914 |
m/e |
06/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7614 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67614 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
320 |
Works Number |
1759 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 06/1931 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 30/07/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Information |
Bunker with coal rail |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1931 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
67B |
|
Hurlford |
6w/e |
30/12/1961 |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
4w/e |
21/04/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/07/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
6w/e |
30/12/1961 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
5w/e |
12/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2914 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7614 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67614 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67614 |
|
|
08/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|