Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 126 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4618 Week
» 29452 Month
» 63784 Year
» 1729160 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2915 m/e 06/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7615 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67615 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V106/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)12/1953
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1760
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1931
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1931
HAY   Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
05/05/1962 Bathgate MPD Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. SLS/196206
11/09/1963 Inverurie Works (Scrapped) In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2915    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7615    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67615    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67615    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev