Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 971 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3277 Week
» 28111 Month
» 62443 Year
» 1727819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2916 m/e 07/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7616 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67616 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V107/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)05/1960
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1761
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1931
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1931
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 17/12/1960
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
14/04/1963 Hurlford MPD (in store) in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2916    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7616    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67616    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67616    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev