Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 551 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6082 Week
» 30916 Month
» 65248 Year
» 1730624 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2917 m/e 08/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7617 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67617 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V108/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)10/1957
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1762
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1931
Withdrawal Mon 27/08/1962
Service Life 31 yrs , 27 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1931
STM   St Margarets on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 11/02/1961
     Withdrawn on 27/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 11/02/1961
WDN   on 27/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2917    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7617    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67617    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
27/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67617    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev