Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 781 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 7407 Week
» 32241 Month
» 66573 Year
» 1731949 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2918 m/e 08/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7618 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67618 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V108/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)09/1958
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 320
Works Number 1763
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1931
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1931
STG   Stirling on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
EFD   Eastfield w/e 12/02/1949
65E   Kipps 4w/e 25/11/1950
65E   Kipps m/e 30/11/1950
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 19/11/1960
65E   Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EFD Eastfield w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 65E Kipps m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 19/11/1960
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2918    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7618    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67618    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67618    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev