Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2920 m/e 10/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7620 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67620 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V110/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)07/1953
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 321
Works Number 1765
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1931
Withdrawal Tue 24/11/1964
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1931
HAY   Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B   Heaton w/e 08/12/1962
52A   Gateshead w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 52B Heaton 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   on 24/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. SLS/196107
05/05/1962 Bathgate MPD Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2920    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7620    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67620    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
24/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 67620    
08/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev