|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2920 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7620 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) | ||
07/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67620 | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
24/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67620 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |