Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 110 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4602 Week
» 29436 Month
» 63768 Year
» 1729144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2922 m/e 10/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7622 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67622 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 321
Works Number 1767
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1931
Withdrawal w/e Mon 05/03/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1931
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 05/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 05/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2922
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1767
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7622    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67622    
05/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67622    
03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev