Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 611 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6142 Week
» 30976 Month
» 65308 Year
» 1730684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2925 m/e 12/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7625 on 16/03/1946
British Railways 67625 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V112/1931
V3 (2-6-2T)08/1953
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 321
Works Number 1770
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1931
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 31 yrs , 29 dys
Information Bunker with coal rail

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1931
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2925    
16/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7625    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67625    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67625    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev