Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2267 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20070 Week
» 73086 Month
» 192613 Year
» 3219466 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
486 |
m/e |
06/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7640 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
67640 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
333 |
Works Number |
1812 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/11/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Information |
Plain bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 486 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7640 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67640 |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67640 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|