Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 85 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6012 Week
» 4750 Month
» 419071 Year
» 1640636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 414 m/e 08/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7645 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67645 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V108/1935
V311/1959
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 335
Works Number 1817
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 08/1935
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 10/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys
Information Plain bunker

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1935
NEV Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52A Gateshead 4w/e 09/11/1957
54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/10/1958
52B Heaton w/e 20/06/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 03/10/1959
52B Heaton w/e 05/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962
52A Gateshead w/e 26/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   on 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 414    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7645    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67645    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67645    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    

prev prev