Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 600 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6131 Week
» 30965 Month
» 65297 Year
» 1730673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 416 m/e 11/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7647 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67647 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V111/1935
V3 (2-6-2T)12/1959
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 335
Works Number 1822
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Mon 21/01/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1935
NEV   Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HTN   Heaton w/e 05/06/1948
51D   Middlesbrough w/e 31/05/1950
51D   Middlesbrough 4w/e 30/06/1950
52A   Gateshead w/e 01/10/1950
52A   Gateshead 4w/e 21/10/1950
51D   Middlesbrough w/e 07/07/1951
51E   Stockton w/e 14/07/1951
51E   Stockton 4w/e 21/07/1951
52A   Gateshead w/e 29/09/1951
52A   Gateshead 4w/e 20/10/1951
52B   Heaton 4w/e 12/07/1952
52B   Heaton 4w/e 19/07/1952
52D   Tweedmouth 4w/e 14/12/1957
52B   Heaton 5w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 21/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough w/e 31/05/1950
ALLOC 52A Gateshead w/e 01/10/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 51E Stockton w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 52A Gateshead w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 52DALN   4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   on 21/01/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 416    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7647    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67647    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
01/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
21/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 67647    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev