Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 77 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5608 Week
» 30442 Month
» 64774 Year
» 1730150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 419 m/e 01/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7650 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67650 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V101/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)09/1958
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 335
Works Number 1826
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 01/1936
Withdrawal Thu 10/08/1961
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1936
STG   Stirling on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/03/1959
     Withdrawn on 10/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/03/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 10/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 419    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7650    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67650    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
10/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 67650    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev