Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 142 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1211 Week
» 1211 Month
» 68073 Year
» 1733449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 440 m/e 03/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7654 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67654 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V103/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)10/1954
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1830
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 03/1936
Withdrawal Mon 23/09/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1936
HTN   Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52A   Gateshead w/e 26/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 23/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   on 23/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 440    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7654    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67654    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
23/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 67654    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev