Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3418 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16824 Week
» 69840 Month
» 189367 Year
» 3216220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
440 |
m/e |
03/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7654 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67654 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
337 |
Works Number |
1830 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1936 |
HTN |
|
Heaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 440 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7654 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67654 |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67654 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|