Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 908 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3214 Week
» 28048 Month
» 62380 Year
» 1727756 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 2898 m/e 03/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7655 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67655 on 19/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1831
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 03/1936
Withdrawal w/e Mon 05/03/1962
Service Life 26 yrs , 4 dys
Information Plain bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1936
PKD   Parkhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 05/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 05/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2898    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7655    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
19/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67655    
05/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67655    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev