Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 104 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4596 Week
» 29430 Month
» 63762 Year
» 1729138 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 454 m/e 03/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7656 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67656 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V103/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)07/1952
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1832
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 03/1936
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/12/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1936
NEV   Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GHD   Gateshead w/e 05/06/1948
BLA   Blaydon w/e 13/11/1948
52D   Tweedmouth 4w/e 18/05/1957
52B   Heaton 5w/e 20/07/1957
52A   Gateshead w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 52DALN   4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 23/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Leeds The first L.N.E.R. locomotive in the Leeds area to receive the new livery is a 'V.1' tank-No. E 7656 (NEV)-and is painted black. The words 'British Railways' appear on the tank sides whilst the number is on the bunker sides SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 454    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7656    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67656    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
23/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 67656    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev