Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 136 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1205 Week
» 1205 Month
» 68067 Year
» 1733443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 455 m/e 04/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7657 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67657 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V104/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)02/1956
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1833
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 04/1936
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1936
NEV   Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52A   Gateshead 5w/e 20/04/1957
64B   Haymarket w/e 08/12/1962
64B   Haymarket 4w/e 22/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52CHEX   4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 7w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 455    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7657    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67657    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67657    
05/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev