Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1096 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18899 Week
» 71915 Month
» 191442 Year
» 3218295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
455 |
m/e |
04/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7657 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67657 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
337 |
Works Number |
1833 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52CHEX |
|
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
64B |
Haymarket |
7w/e |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 455 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7657 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67657 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67657 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|