Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 356 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1425 Week
» 1425 Month
» 68287 Year
» 1733663 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 461 m/e 04/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7658 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67658 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V104/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)01/1960
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1834
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 04/1936
Withdrawal Mon 23/09/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1936
BLA   Blaydon on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B   Heaton 5w/e 20/07/1957
52A   Gateshead w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 23/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52CHEX   4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   on 23/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1954 Darlington Works North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. SLS/195404
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 461    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7658    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67658    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
23/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 67658    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev