Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1019 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5511 Week
» 30345 Month
» 64677 Year
» 1730053 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 466 m/e 07/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7660 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67660 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
V107/1936
V3 (2-6-2T)05/1956
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 337
Works Number 1838
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 07/1936
Withdrawal w/e Mon 05/02/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Information Hopper bunker

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1936
KPS   Kipps on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
65C   Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
65E   Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 21/10/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 14/01/1961
ALLOC 65E Kipps 4w/e 11/03/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 2w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 05/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 466    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7660    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67660    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kipps (65E)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
05/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67660    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev